MD HB148 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Unknown
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 19 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-19 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing to five the number of regular members and eliminating substitute members on the Allegany County Board of Elections and the Frederick County Board of Elections; requiring the members of the boards to be of specified political parties; requiring that a vacancy on the boards be filled in a specified manner; etc.
Title
Allegany County and Frederick County - Boards of Elections - Membership
Sponsors
No sponsor information available at this time. |
Roll Calls
2011-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-19 | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) | |
2011-04-05 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2011-04-04 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-04-04 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-04-07 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (138-0) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-01-26 | Hearing 2/8 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-01-26 | First Reading Ways and Means |