MD HB149 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Designating the Office of the Secretary of Transportation as the State Safety Oversight Authority for the Maryland Transit Administration's light rail transit system and Metro subway in accordance with federal law; requiring the deputy secretary of transportation or the deputy secretary's designee to exercise safety authority over the Administration's light rail transit system and Metro subway; and authorizing the Office of the Secretary to adopt regulations to carry out its safety oversight authority.
Title
Transportation - Light Rail and Metro Subway - State Safety Oversight Authority
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 112 |
2017-04-04 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2017-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2017-03-07 | House | Third Reading Passed (138-0) |
2017-03-02 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-02 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-01 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:15 p.m. |
2017-02-08 | House | Hearing canceled |
2017-02-09 | House | Hearing 2/09 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-18 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |