MD HB1512 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Enrolled on April 6 2024 - 75% progression
Action: 2024-04-06 - Returned Passed
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the termination date for certain provisions of law that expand the authorized uses of the Bay Restoration Fund to include certain costs associated with the connection of a property using an on-site sewage disposal system to a certain existing municipal wastewater facility.
Title
Bay Restoration Fund - Use of Funds - Municipal Wastewater Facilities - Sunset Repeal
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-05 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2024-04-05 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-22 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-21 | Senate | Hearing 4/03 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-0) |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-16 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-03-09 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 3:00 p.m. |
2024-03-09 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-03-05 | House | Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-03-04 | House | Rereferred to Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-22 | House | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations |
Same As/Similar To
SB1173 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-06 - Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Subjects
Chesapeake Bay Restoration
Environment
Environmental Matters
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Sunset
Utilities
Wastewater
Environment
Environmental Matters
Refuse Disposal
Revenue and Taxes
Sewage
Sunset
Utilities
Wastewater
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Chapter of the Acts | 2020 | (n/a) | See Bill Text | |
Environment | 9 | 1605.2 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |