MD HB163 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-13 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that the prohibition on using a text messaging device while driving does not apply to the use of voice recognition technology that allows the hands-free sending of a text message or an electronic message or the use of a text messaging device to listen to a text message or an electronic message; etc.
Title
Motor Vehicles - Prohibition on Use of Text Messaging Device While Driving -
Sponsors
Del. Sam Arora [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-13 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-02-06 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-24 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0163.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0163f.pdf |