MD HB173 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-07 - Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring each committed facility licensed by the Department of Juvenile Services to serve no more than 48 children at one time, unless the Secretary of Juvenile Services finds good cause for a committed facility licensed by the Department to serve more than 48 children at one time.
Title
Human Services - Quality Care - Juvenile Facilities
Sponsors
Del. Jon Cardin [D] | Del. Dan Morhaim [D] | Del. Dana Stein [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-07 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-07 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-12 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-26 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-25 | Hearing 2/4 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-25 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-01-20 | Hearing 2/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-20 | First Reading Judiciary |