MD HB173 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the presumption of compensability under the workers' compensation law to include, under specified conditions, Anne Arundel County detention officers who suffer from heart disease or hypertension resulting in partial or total disability or death; requiring Anne Arundel County detention officers to submit specified medical disclosures to the Anne Arundel County Sheriff; allowing benefits under the Act to be added to retirement benefits subject to a specified limitation; etc.
Title
Workers' Compensation - Heart Disease and Hypertension Presumption - Anne Arundel County Detention Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-5) (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2015-03-12 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-5) (Y: 129 N: 5 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2015-04-06 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-02 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Hearing 3/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-03-13 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2015-03-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-5) |
2015-03-10 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2015-03-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments {673198/1 Report Adopted |
2015-03-09 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2015-02-11 | House | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-01-29 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Correctional Officers
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Health
Local Government Mandates
Workers' Compensation
Correctional Officers
Death
Disabilities
Disclosure
Diseases
Health
Local Government Mandates
Workers' Compensation