MD HB174 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the definition of "public funds", as it relates to local government investment guidelines, to exclude funds held by specified local governments for self-insurance purposes.
Title
Local Government Self-Insurance Funds - Investment Guidelines
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 133 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-21 | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-03-16 | First Reading Budget and Taxation | |
2012-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2012-03-15 | Third Reading Passed (133-0) | |
2012-03-13 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-13 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-12 | Favorable Report by Appropriations | |
2012-01-25 | Hearing 2/7 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-01-25 | First Reading Appropriations |