MD HB197 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-1)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-28 - Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State to reimburse a county board for certain payments on a certain application for reimbursement; requiring a county board to pay up to $300 towards the exam fee for a student who takes a certain exam; requiring the State Board of Education to adopt certain regulations; etc.
Title
Education - State Reimbursement for County Board Payments for Exams for Eligible Students
Sponsors
Del. Eric Luedtke [D] | Sen. Cory McCray [D] | Del. April Rose [R] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] |
Del. Carolyn Howard [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] | Del. James Tarlau [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-2) (Y: 136 N: 3 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs) |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (135-2) |
2018-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments {975468/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-16 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-08 | House | Hearing 2/08 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-18 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Fees
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Students
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Examinations
Fees
Prices
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reimbursement Rates
Rules and Regulations
Students