MD HB208 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 29 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-01 - Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment
Pending: Senate Education, Energy, and the Environment Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a county public library from charging a fine for overdue library materials borrowed by a minor or intended for children or teens; prohibiting a county public library from charging a reserve fee for library materials reserved by a minor or intended for children or teens; prohibiting a county public library from prohibiting the borrowing of library materials by a minor or the borrowing of library materials intended for children or teen because of a previous overdue library materials; etc.
Title
County Public Libraries - Minors, Children, and Teens - Prohibited Practices
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-29 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 110 N: 29 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-01 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-02-29 | House | Third Reading Passed (110-29) |
2024-02-27 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-02-27 | House | Favorable with Amendments {293725/1 Adopted |
2024-02-26 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2024-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-09-10 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB250 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 208