MD HB214 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 46-0)
Status: Passed on May 13 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-13 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 422
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Authorizing, for purposes of filing a petition for U Nonimmigrant Status, a victim of qualifying criminal activity or the victim's parent, guardian, or next friend to request a certifying official to certify victim helpfulness on a Form I-918, Supplement B certification under certain circumstances; providing the certifying entity must certify or decline certification of the form within 90 days of receiving a certain request; providing that a certifying entity or official is immune from certain criminal or civil liability; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Victims and Witnesses - U Nonimmigrant Status - Certification of Victim Helpfulness

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (115-25) (Y: 115 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-09 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (113-23) (Y: 114 N: 24 NV: 1 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-13HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 422
2019-04-04HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-04HouseThird Reading Passed (115-25)
2019-04-04HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (44-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {378173/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12SenateFirst Reading Judicial Proceedings
2019-03-12HouseThird Reading Passed (113-23)
2019-03-08HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-08HouseFloor Amendment {803422/1 (Delegate Pena-Melnyk) Adopted
2019-03-08HouseMotion Reconsider Second Reading (Delegate Clippinger) Adopted
2019-03-07HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-07HouseFavorable with Amendments {602811/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-06HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary
2019-01-24HouseHearing 2/05 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-23HouseFirst Reading Judiciary

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0214&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0214f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0214t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0214e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0214_60281101.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0214_80342201.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0214_37817301.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0214.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0214_jud.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0374.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0214_jpr.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1049.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1272.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback