MD HB215 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 25 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-03-25 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Stating the intent of the General Assembly that the Governor include funding in the State budget on a phased-in basis to employ additional Natural Resources police officers to achieve specified staffing levels.
Title
Natural Resources Police Force - Number of Officers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-21 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (108-25) (Y: 108 N: 25 NV: 0 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-03-25 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Budget and Taxation |
2013-03-25 | House | Third Reading Passed (108-25) |
2013-03-23 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments {780719/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-23 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters |
2013-01-28 | House | Reassigned to Environmental Matters and Appropriations |
2013-02-06 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. (Environmental Matters) |
2013-01-21 | House | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Budgets
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment
Law Enforcement
Natural Resources
Natural Resources - Generally
Natural Resources, Department of
Reports
Work, Labor and Employment