MD HB237 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 16 2021 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-02-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Department of Education to establish, by October 1, 2021, a stakeholder advisory group to develop a reading and dyslexia handbook to guide local school systems in the implementation of best practices for early literacy and dyslexia; requiring a completed handbook be made available to the public by June 1, 2022; requiring the identification of tools and materials to address the needs of at-risk and struggling students with dyslexia; requiring the Department to update the handbook every 3 years; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Early Literacy and Dyslexia Practices - Guidance and Assistance
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-02-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-17 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {175067/1 Adopted |
2021-02-10 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/20 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2020-09-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB126 (Crossfiled) 2021-01-06 - Hearing 1/27 at 11:00 a.m.
Subjects
Age
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
internet
Language
Literacy
Primary and Secondary Education
Students
Time
Weights and Measures
Committees and Commissions
Communications
Disabilities
Education
Education, State Department of
internet
Language
Literacy
Primary and Secondary Education
Students
Time
Weights and Measures
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Education | 1 | 101 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 4 | 136 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Education | 8 | 420 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |