MD HB241 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-27 - Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempting an applicant for renewal or transfer of a vehicle registration from the requirement that the applicant be denied if the applicant has unpaid taxes or unemployment insurance contributions if the applicant's income is at or below 200% of the federal poverty level, the applicant's principal tax liability is below $10,000, or the applicant qualifies for Currently Not Collectible status under the Internal Revenue Manual; etc.
Title
Vehicle Laws - License and Registration Renewal - Denial
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-27 | House | Unfavorable Report by Environment and Transportation; Withdrawn |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2019-01-29 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Communications
Comptroller
Debt Collection
Drivers' Licenses
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Welfare
Comptroller
Debt Collection
Drivers' Licenses
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Motor Vehicle Administration
Notices
Registration
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Vehicle Laws - Licensing and Registration
Welfare