MD HB25 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing that a provision in the declaration of a condominium or in a governing document of a homeowners association that requires any action on the part of a holder of a mortgage or deed of trust on a unit or a lot in order to make certain amendments shall be deemed satisfied if certain procedures are satisfied under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Condominiums and Homeowners Associations - Amendments to Declarations and Governing Documents
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-15 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-02-20 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 32 |
2020-03-16 | House | Returned Passed |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2020-02-18 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2020-02-17 | House | Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-01-08 | House | Hearing 1/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2019-10-17 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB293 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 33
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Real Property | 11 | 103 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Real Property | 11B | 116 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |