MD HB267 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-3)
Status: Passed on May 25 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from $3,000,000 to $6,000,000 the maximum amount that may be transferred, in the State budget or through a specified budget amendment process, to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund from funds that are distributed to Program Open Space; and requiring that, if more than $3,000,000 is transferred to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Fund under the Act, the amount exceeding $3,000,000 shall be provided from the State's share of funds.
Title
Program Open Space - Authorized Transfer to the Maryland Heritage Areas Authority Financing Fund - Increase
Sponsors
Del. Brett Wilson [R] | Del. Curtis Anderson [D] | Del. Eric Ebersole [D] | Del. Bob Flanagan [R] |
Del. Brooke Lierman [D] | Sen. Johnny Mautz [R] | Del. Andrew Platt [D] | Sen. Mary Washington [D] |
Roll Calls
2017-03-10 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (136-0) (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 660 |
2017-03-28 | House | Returned Passed |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Hearing 3/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-03-15 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2017-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2017-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2017-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {644963/1 Report Adopted |
2017-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Appropriations |
2017-02-07 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2017-01-27 | House | Reassigned to Appropriations |
2017-01-23 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Subjects
Appropriations
Budgets
Historical Matters
Natural Resources - Generally
Operating Budget
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes
Budgets
Historical Matters
Natural Resources - Generally
Operating Budget
Program Open Space
Revenue and Taxes