MD HB269 | 2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1534
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Urban Agriculture Grant Program in the Department of Agriculture to increase the viability of urban farming and improve access to urban-grown foods; establishing an Urban Agriculture Grant Fund to provide grants to nonprofit organizations in Baltimore City; requiring the Secretary of Agriculture to administer the Fund; authorizing the Governor to include in the annual budget bill an appropriation for the Fund; requiring the Department to seek input from certain entities in adopting certain regulations; etc.
Title
Department of Agriculture - Urban Agriculture Grant Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-12 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2021-04-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 6 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2021-02-12 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 8 NV: 0 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 319 |
2021-04-12 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2021-04-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (132-6) |
2021-04-12 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2021-04-12 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Floor Amendment {294838/1 (Senator Gallion) Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Adopted |
2021-04-10 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-16 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-02-12 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-8) |
2021-02-11 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-02-11 | House | Favorable with Amendments {970612/1 Adopted |
2021-02-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2020-12-22 | House | Hearing 1/15 at 11:00 a.m. |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
2020-07-15 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
HB1534 (Carry Over) 2020-03-17 - Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
SB673 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
SB673 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 320
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Environmental Health
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Agriculture, Department of
Animals
Appropriations
Baltimore City
Budgets
Committees and Commissions
Community Development
Environmental Health
Grants
Nonprofit Organizations
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Urban Areas
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Agriculture | 2 | 2001 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2002 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2003 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2004 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Agriculture | 2 | 2005 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |