MD HB286 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-0)
Status: Passed on May 25 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-25 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Providing an exception to the voter registration deadline to allow an individual to appear, on election day, at a precinct polling place in the individual's county of residence and apply to register to vote; requiring an applicant for voter registration on election day to provide certain proof of residency; requiring the State Board of Elections to take appropriate measures to notify potential registrants of the correct precinct polling place for the potential registrants' residence addresses under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Election Law - Registration and Voting at Precinct Polling Places

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (97-39) (Y: 97 N: 39 NV: 0 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-03-21 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (32-15) (Y: 33 N: 16 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2019-02-22 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (98-41) (Y: 99 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-25HouseEnacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 609
2019-04-01HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-01HouseThird Reading Passed (97-39)
2019-04-01HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-03-25SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (32-15)
2019-03-22SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments {544135/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-22SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-25SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-02-22HouseThird Reading Passed (98-41)
2019-02-20HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-20HouseFavorable with Amendments {575266/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-18HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
2019-01-25HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-25HouseFirst Reading Ways and Means

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0286&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0286f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0286t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0286e.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/Chapters_noln/CH_609_hb0286e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0286_57526601.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0006/hb0286_54413501.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0006/hb0286.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0286_w&m.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0140.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0286_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/0781.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1064.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback