MD HB29 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-01-22 - Hearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Altering the membership of the Correctional Officers' Retirement System to include Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services employees in the position of chaplain on or after July 1, 2019; requiring a certain transfer and combination of certain service credit for certain individuals; requiring the Board of Trustees for the State Retirement and Pension System to calculate a certain disability benefit for certain individuals and to grant a certain benefit under certain circumstances; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Correctional Officers' Retirement System - Membership - Chaplains

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-01-22HouseHearing 1/29 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-09HouseFirst Reading Appropriations
2018-11-13HousePre-filed

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback