MD HB297 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB64
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on April 3 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-04-05 - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Office of the Correctional Ombudsman; authorizing the Justice Reinvestment Oversight Board to make a recommendation for the distribution of money from the Performance Incentive Grant Fund to the Office; requiring the Office to conduct investigations, reviews, and assessments of administrative acts taken by the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, by the Department of Juvenile Services, or in relation to individuals confined by either department; providing for the confidentiality of certain communications; etc.
Title
Office of the Correctional Ombudsman - Establishment and Funding
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-03 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 103 N: 32 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-05 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2024-04-04 | Senate | Referred Rules |
2024-04-03 | House | Third Reading Passed (103-32) |
2024-04-03 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments {693322/1 Adopted |
2024-04-03 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2024-02-13 | House | Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2024-01-15 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
Same As/Similar To
SB134 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-08 - Passed Enrolled
HB64 (Carry Over) 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
HB64 (Carry Over) 2023-01-17 - Hearing 1/24 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary)
Subjects
Appropriations
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Correctional Institutions
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Evidence
Governor
Grants
Health
Injury
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Ombudsmen
Prisoners
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Subpoenas
Testimony
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workplace Retaliation
Attorney General
Budget and Management, Department of
Committees and Commissions
complaints
Correctional Institutions
Corrections
Crimes and Punishments
Death
Discipline
Disclosure
Education
Electronic Government
Evidence
Governor
Grants
Health
Injury
Inspections
internet
Investigations and Inquiries
Job Training
Juvenile Services, Department of
Mental and Behavioral Health
Ombudsmen
Prisoners
Privacy
Privileged Communications
Public Employees
Public Safety and Correctional Services, Department of
Records
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Subpoenas
Testimony
Work, Labor, and Employment
Workplace Retaliation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
State Government | 6 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 403 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 404 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 405 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 6 | 406 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3801 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3802 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3803 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3804 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3805 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3806 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3807 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3808 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3811 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3812 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3813 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3814 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3815 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Government | 9 | 3816 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Personnel and Pensions | 5 | 305 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |