MD HB308 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 20 2019 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-02 - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an applicant for a certificate of public convenience and necessity for certain construction to conduct a rapid health impact assessment (HIA) on the project and report on its findings; requiring a rapid HIA report to be completed not later than 45 days after the applicant submits the applicant's application to the Public Service Commission; requiring an applicant to complete the rapid HIA in a certain manner; requiring the rapid HIA report to be considered part of a certain application; etc.
Title
Public Service Commission - Certificate of Public Convenience and Necessity - Rapid Health Impact Assessment and Final Action
Sponsors
Del. Robbyn Lewis [D] | Del. Lorig Charkoudian [D] | Del. Terri Hill [D] | Del. Mary Ann Lisanti [D] |
Del. Emily Shetty [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (102-32) (Y: 103 N: 33 NV: 4 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-02 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Rereferred to Finance |
2019-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-03-20 | House | Third Reading Passed (102-32) |
2019-03-19 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-03-19 | House | Favorable with Amendments {903996/1 Report Adopted |
2019-03-18 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2019-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-01-28 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Construction
Counties
Environmental Health
Equipment
Federal Government
Health
Health, Department of
Notices
Pollution
Public Health
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Reports
Safety
Utilities
Utility Regulation
Counties
Environmental Health
Equipment
Federal Government
Health
Health, Department of
Notices
Pollution
Public Health
Public Service Commission
Real Property
Reports
Safety
Utilities
Utility Regulation