MD HB32 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-11 - Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allowing certain caregivers a credit against the State income tax equal to 30% of certain qualified expenses paid or incurred during the taxable year that exceed $2,000 to provide care or support to certain qualified family members; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after December 31, 2023.
Title
Income Tax - Caregiver Tax Credit
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-11 | House | Hearing 2/01 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-10 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2023-08-02 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Accessibility - see also- Blind; Deaf; DevDisPer; PhysDisPer
Caregivers
Comptroller
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Equipment
Home Care Services
Home Improvement
Income Tax
kinship
Physically Disabled Persons
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Transportation
Caregivers
Comptroller
Developmentally Disabled Persons
Equipment
Home Care Services
Home Improvement
Income Tax
kinship
Physically Disabled Persons
Rules and Regulations
Tax Credits
Taxes - Income
Transportation
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Tax - General | 10 | 758 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0032?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0032f.pdf |