MD HB327 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing by two members the membership of the Board of Community College Trustees for Anne Arundel County; and requiring the Governor to consider the geographic and ethnic representation of Anne Arundel County when making appointments to the Board.
Title
Anne Arundel County - Board of Community College Trustees - Membership Alterations and Appointment Requirements
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 11) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 236 |
2024-03-29 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-27 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (123-0) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Appropriations |
2024-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/06 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-15 | House | First Reading Appropriations |
Same As/Similar To
SB69 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 235
Subjects
Anne Arundel County
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Demographics
Education
Governor
Higher Education
Public Officials
Residency
Committees and Commissions
Community Colleges
Community Colleges - Local Bills
Demographics
Education
Governor
Higher Education
Public Officials
Residency