MD HB340 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-11)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 74-11)
Status: Passed on May 12 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-05-12 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Governor annually to proclaim July 2 as Thurgood Marshall Day; and requiring the proclamation to urge educational and cultural organizations to observe Thurgood Marshall Day properly.
Title
General Provisions - Commemorative Days - Thurgood Marshall Day
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2015-03-16 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-05-12 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 241 |
2015-04-10 | House | Returned Passed |
2015-04-09 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-20 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2015-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2015-03-18 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2015-03-18 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2015-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations |
2015-02-18 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2015-02-05 | House | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Governor
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials
Historical Matters
Holidays and Special Dates
State Government - Agencies, Offices, and Officials