MD HB349 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-03-16 - Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adding televisions to the list of products regulated under the Maryland Efficiency Standards Act; providing that the Act does not apply to televisions manufactured before a specified date; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to adopt regulations establishing minimum efficiency standards and compliance test methods for televisions; etc.
Title
Maryland Efficiency Standards Act - Televisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-16 | Unfavorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2010-02-24 | Hearing 3/4 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-16 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-10 | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-09 | Hearing cancelled | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/11 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-27 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Commerce and Business
Conservation
Consumer Protection
Energy Matters
Rules and Regulations
Television
Commerce and Business
Conservation
Consumer Protection
Energy Matters
Rules and Regulations
Television
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0349.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0349f.pdf |