MD HB349 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-09 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the penalties for violations of provisions of law relating to perpetual care trusts, preneed trusts, and the operation of a cemetery, crematory, or burial goods business; providing that a person who willfully misappropriates or intentionally and fraudulently converts perpetual care trust funds or preneed trust funds in excess of a specified amount is guilty of a felony and subject to a specified penalty; etc.
Title
Business Regulation - Cemeteries - Prohibited Acts and Penalties
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-28 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (44-0) (Y: 44 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2012-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-09 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 99 |
2013-04-02 | House | Returned Passed |
2013-04-02 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-0) |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2013-03-29 | Senate | Favorable Report by Finance |
2013-03-27 | Senate | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Finance |
2013-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2013-03-13 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2013-03-13 | House | Favorable with Amendments {796080/1 Report Adopted |
2013-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations |
2013-02-14 | House | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-31 | House | Reassigned to Health and Government Operations |
2013-01-30 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-25 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Business Regulation and Occupations
Cemeteries
Contracts
Cremation
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Funerals
Morticians
Penalties and Sentences
Cemeteries
Contracts
Cremation
Crimes and Punishments
Fines
Fraud
Funerals
Morticians
Penalties and Sentences