MD HB349 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 13-5)
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 17 2014 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-03-25 - Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: Senate Budget and Taxation Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Department of Legislative Services to conduct a study on the use of specified alternative financing methods by local school systems for school construction; and requiring the Department to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor on or before December 15, 2014.
Title
Education - Study of Alternative Financing Methods for the Purpose of School Construction
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-13 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 137 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-03-25 | Senate | Hearing 3/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Budget and Taxation |
2014-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2014-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {695467/1 Report Adopted |
2014-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2014-02-19 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-22 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Construction
Education, Boards of
Leases and Rent
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
State Aid
Education, Boards of
Leases and Rent
Legislative Services, Department of
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Reports
State Aid