MD HB364 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 10 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-10 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State Board of Education, in consultation with county boards of education, to report to specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2011, regarding minimum academic performance standards that students in public high schools in the State should meet in order to participate in high school athletic competitions; requiring the report to include specified recommendations; etc.
Title
Student Participation in High School Sports - Minimum Academic Requirements -
Sponsors
Del. Jay Walker [D] |
Roll Calls
2011-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 123 N: 14 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2011-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-26 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 13 NV: 1 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-10 | Approved by the Governor | |
2011-04-06 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (47-0) | |
2011-04-05 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2011-04-05 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2011-04-08 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-03-29 | Hearing 4/5 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-03-25 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2011-04-08 | Passed Enrolled | |
2011-04-08 | Third Reading Passed (123-14) | |
2011-04-08 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2011-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (124-13) | |
2011-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2011-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2011-03-26 | Favorable Report by Ways and Means | |
2011-02-09 | Hearing 2/24 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2011-02-03 | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Students
Education, Boards of
Education, State Board of
Public Schools
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Sports and Recreation
Students