MD HB364 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 32-7)
Status: Vetoed on May 24 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-24 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibiting health care practitioners and certain students and trainees from performing certain examinations on a patient who is under anesthesia or unconscious unless informed consent has been obtained from the patient, the examination is within the standard of care, the patient is unconscious and the examination is required for diagnostic or treatment purposes, or an emergency exists, it is impractical to obtain the patient's consent, and the examination is required for diagnostic or treatment purposes; etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Health Care Practitioners - Medical Examinations on Anesthetized or Unconscious Patients

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-25 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (138-0) (Y: 138 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2019-03-01 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 4 Abs: 8) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-24HouseVetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
2019-04-03HousePassed Enrolled
2019-04-03HouseThird Reading Passed (138-0)
2019-04-03HouseHouse Concur - Senate Amendments
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed with Amendments (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments {614230/1 Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-04SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-01HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-02-26HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-02-26HouseFavorable with Amendments {556583/1 Report Adopted
2019-02-25HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Health and Government Operations

Subjects


Maryland State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/webmga/frmMain.aspx?id=hb0364&stab=01&pid=billpage&tab=subject3&ys=2019rs
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0364f.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0364t.pdf
Texthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/bills/hb/hb0364e.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0364_55658301.pdf
Amendmenthttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov//2019RS/amds/bil_0004/hb0364_61423001.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/fnotes/bil_0004/hb0364.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0364_hgo.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/0250.pdf
Supplementhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes_comm/hb0364_ehe.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/Senate/1032.pdf
Roll Callhttp://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2019RS/votes/House/1221.pdf

Bill Comments

feedback