MD HB388 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 183
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

Limiting the hours within which certain individuals are required to provide a certain view of the interior of licensed premises where alcoholic beverages are served that allows an individual standing on the outside to observe the interior of the licensed premises; authorizing a license holder to install a protective covering over an exterior door or window of the licensed premises under certain circumstances; and providing that the Act does not prevent an inspection and search of the premises under certain circumstances.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Charles County - Alcoholic Beverages - View of Licensed Premises

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-03-27 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (135-0) (Y: 136 N: 1 NV: 2 Abs: 10) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-04-18HouseApproved by the Governor - Chapter 183
2019-04-03HouseReturned Passed
2019-04-02SenateThird Reading Passed (45-0)
2019-04-01SenateSecond Reading Passed
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report Adopted
2019-04-01SenateFavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-19SenateHearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-03-18SenateFirst Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
2019-03-18HouseThird Reading Passed (135-0)
2019-03-15HouseSecond Reading Passed with Amendments
2019-03-15HouseFavorable with Amendments {153992/1 Report Adopted
2019-03-13HouseFavorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
2019-01-30HouseHearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m.
2019-01-30HouseFirst Reading Economic Matters

Subjects


Maryland State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback