MD HB392 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-05 - Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m.
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Providing that it is lawful for a person to intercept a wire, oral, or electronic communication if the person is working as a fair housing tester for a fair housing testing program operated by the federal government, the State, a local government, or a nonprofit civil rights organization under certain circumstances.
Title
Evidence - Wiretapping and Electronic Surveillance - Fair Housing Testing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 2:30 p.m. |
2024-02-05 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-23 | House | Hearing 2/07 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-17 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
SB57 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-19 - Hearing 3/21 at 1:00 p.m.
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Counties
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Federal Government
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Wiretapping
Civil Rights and Social Equity
Counties
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Surveillance
Evidence
Federal Government
Housing
Housing and Community Development
Municipal Corporations
Nonprofit Organizations
Wiretapping
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 401 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 402 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Legislation/Details/HB0392?ys=2024RS |
Text | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/2024RS/bills/hb/hb0392f.pdf |