MD HB40 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 8 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the standard of proof by which the court must make a certain finding relating to the admission in evidence, during certain criminal trials, of a statement offered against a party who caused the unavailability of the declarant of the statement under certain circumstances; etc.
Title
Criminal Procedure - Evidence - Causing Unavailability of Witness
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 130 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2020-03-17 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 43 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2020-03-13 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-05-08 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 607 |
2020-03-18 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2020-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (130-0) |
2020-03-18 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (43-2) |
2020-03-17 | Senate | Motion Rules Suspend Two Readings Same Day Const/Rule 24 (Senator King) Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {928272/1 Adopted |
2020-03-16 | Senate | Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Smith) Adopted |
2020-03-15 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-03-13 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-0) |
2020-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {902917/1 Adopted |
2020-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-15 | House | Hearing 2/18 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2020-01-09 | House | Hearing 1/21 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
2019-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Same As/Similar To
SB64 (Crossfiled) 2020-05-08 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 608
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Courts and Judicial Proceedings | 10 | 901 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |