MD HB428 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on May 18 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-18 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the Board of License Commissioners for Montgomery County, for the 2020-2021 licensing period, to refund holders of certain alcoholic beverages licenses the entire amount of the annual license fee and to refund holders of certain other alcoholic beverages licenses a certain amount of the annual license fee for the 2021-2022 licensing period; and requiring the Board, for the 2021-2022 licensing period, to waive the late fee for certain alcoholic beverages licenses.
Title
Montgomery County - Alcoholic Beverages Licenses - Annual Fees MC 19-21
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2021-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 134 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 5) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-18 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 231 |
2021-04-09 | House | Returned Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2021-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m. |
2021-03-19 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2021-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (134-1) |
2021-03-12 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2021-03-12 | House | Favorable with Amendments {453490/1 Adopted |
2021-03-08 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2021-01-18 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:30 p.m. |
2021-01-15 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - By Subdivision
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Emergency Bills
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset
Alcoholic Beverages - Local Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Emergency Bills
Fees
License Commissioners, Boards of
Montgomery County
Reimbursement Rates
Sunset