MD HB45 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Vetoed on May 15 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-05-15 - Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative)
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Providing for an exception to a requirement that specified court documents be published in the Maryland Register if the court document is posted on the Web site of the Maryland Judiciary.
Title
Maryland Register - Publication of Court Documents - Exception
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2014-03-22 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (47-0) (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-1) (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
2014-02-27 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (128-1) (Y: 128 N: 1 NV: 3 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-05-15 | House | Vetoed by the Governor (Duplicative) |
2014-04-01 | House | Returned Passed |
2014-03-31 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (47-0) |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-28 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2014-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-1) |
2014-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2014-02-25 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2014-02-24 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2014-01-23 | House | Hearing 1/23 at 2:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-01-17 | House | Hearing cancelled (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-01-22 | House | Hearing 1/22 at 1:00 p.m. (Health and Government Operations) |
2014-01-14 | House | Hearing 1/14 at 1:00 p.m. (Judiciary) |
2014-01-08 | House | First Reading Judiciary and Health and Government Operations |
2013-11-01 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Courts
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Maryland Register
Public Information
State Documents
Courts and Court Personnel - Statewide
Electronic Government
Maryland Register
Public Information
State Documents