MD HB464 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-05 - Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting the Department of Agriculture, the Department of the Environment, and the Department of Natural Resources from adopting regulations to help the State meet the agricultural sector requirements of the Total Maximum Daily Load for the Chesapeake Bay unless New York, Pennsylvania, Virginia, West Virginia, and the District of Columbia achieve or exceed the percentage reduction of nitrogen and the percentage reduction of phosphorus that the State has achieved from 2009 levels under specified circumstances.
Title
Agriculture - Total Maximum Daily Load - Regulations
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-05 | Unfavorable Report by Environmental Matters Withdrawn | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing 2/29 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-08 | Hearing cancelled | |
2012-02-03 | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-02 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Agriculture
Agriculture, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Environment, Department of
Farmland
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Interstate Affairs
Natural Resources, Department of
Pollution
Rules and Regulations
Water
Agriculture, Department of
Chesapeake Bay
Environment, Department of
Farmland
Hazardous and Toxic Substances
Interstate Affairs
Natural Resources, Department of
Pollution
Rules and Regulations
Water
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2012rs/billfile/HB0464.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2012rs/bills/hb/hb0464f.pdf |