MD HB465 | 2024 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous HB1261
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 15-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing, from $5,000 to $10,000, the maximum civil penalty for the knowing failure of an employer to properly classify an individual as an employee; and requiring the Commissioner of Labor and Industry, on a showing by clear and convincing evidence that a violation has occurred, to refer to the Comptroller, certain State's Attorneys, the U.S. Department of Justice, the U.S. Department of Labor, and the U.S. Department of the Treasury complaints that allege a violation of certain tax laws.
Title
Workplace Fraud and Prevailing Wage - Violations - Civil Penalty and Referrals
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-06 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 30 N: 12 NV: 2 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 34 N: 13 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-03-16 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 101 N: 36 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 309 |
2024-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (30-12) |
2024-04-06 | Senate | Senate Recede |
2024-04-06 | Senate | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-06 | Senate | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-05 | House | House Requests Senate Recede |
2024-04-05 | House | House Refuses Concur Senate Amendments |
2024-04-03 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (34-13) |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-02 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {903923/1 Adopted |
2024-04-01 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Finance |
2024-03-16 | House | Third Reading Passed (101-36) |
2024-03-14 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments {703227/1 Adopted |
2024-03-14 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2024-01-24 | House | Hearing 1/31 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-22 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB436 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-14 - Referred Economic Matters
HB1261 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
HB1261 (Carry Over) 2023-03-06 - Rereferred to Economic Matters
Subjects
Civil Offenses
complaints
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Federal Government
Fines
Fraud
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
State's Attorneys
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor, and Employment
complaints
Comptroller
Crimes and Punishments
Evidence
Federal Government
Fines
Fraud
Labor and Industry, Division of
Penalties and Sentences
Private Sector Labor and Industry
Procurement
Revenue and Taxes
Salaries and Compensation
State Government - Procurement
State's Attorneys
Taxes - Income
Work, Labor, and Employment
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Labor and Employment | 3 | 909 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Labor and Employment | 3 | 910 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
State Finance and Procurement | 17 | 227 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |