MD HB47 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-12 - Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Constitution to provide that legislative districting shall, to the greatest extent practicable, result in a resident delegate from every county; and submitting the amendment to the qualified voters of the State for their adoption or rejection.
Title
Legislative Districting - Resident Delegates by County
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-12 | Unfavorable Report by House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2010-03-03 | Hearing 3/8 at 2:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-13 | First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations | |
2009-11-03 | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Maryland State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://mgaleg.maryland.gov/mgawebsite/Search/Legislation?target=/2010rs/billfile/HB0047.htm |
Text | http://mlis.state.md.us/2010rs/bills/hb/hb0047f.pdf |