MD HB47 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2013 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-02-26 - Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m.
Pending: House Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring, except under specified circumstances, a married couple who files a joint federal income tax return to file a joint Maryland income tax return; requiring a married couple who does not file a joint federal income tax return to file a joint Maryland income tax return or a married filing separately Maryland income tax return; and applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2012.
Title
Income Tax - Joint Returns - Married Couples
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-02-26 | House | Hearing 2/26 at 1:00 p.m. |
2013-01-23 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-02-05 | House | Hearing 2/05 at 1:30 p.m. |
2013-01-18 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-30 | House | Hearing 1/30 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-01-16 | House | Hearing cancelled |
2013-01-16 | House | Hearing 1/16 at 11:00 a.m. |
2013-01-09 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
2012-11-13 | House | Pre-filed |