MD HB47 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-03-01 - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a public institution of higher education in the State from entering into or renewing a contract with U.S. Immigration and Customs Enforcement; and providing that existing obligations or contract rights may not be impaired by the Act.
Title
Public Institutions of Higher Education – Contracts – Prohibition
Sponsors
Del. Julian Ivey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-01 | House | Withdrawn by Sponsor |
2021-02-01 | House | Hearing canceled (Appropriations) |
2021-01-19 | House | Hearing 2/03 at 1:30 p.m. (Appropriations) |
2021-01-13 | House | First Reading Appropriations and Judiciary |
2020-10-24 | House | Pre-filed |
Subjects
Contracts
Federal Government
Higher Education
Immigrants and Citizenship
State Universities and Colleges
Federal Government
Higher Education
Immigrants and Citizenship
State Universities and Colleges