MD HB471 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 27 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-07 - Unfavorable Report by Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amending the Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 to provide that the Board of Directors of the Supported Living, Inc. have until June 1, 2016, to provide a matching fund for a grant for the Supported Living Facility, located in Howard County; etc.
Title
Maryland Consolidated Capital Bond Loan of 2012 - Howard County - Supported Living Facility Ho. Co. 11-14
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-07 | House | Unfavorable Report by Appropriations |
2014-02-25 | House | Hearing 2/25 at 1:00 p.m. |
2014-01-27 | House | First Reading Appropriations |