MD HB472 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring an order to docket or complaint to foreclose on residential property to be accompanied by an additional filing fee, a specified final or preliminary loss mitigation affidavit, and, if applicable, a specified request for foreclosure mediation; altering the information required to be included in a specified notice form; requiring the secured party to file a specified final loss mitigation affidavit and send to the mortgagor or grantor a copy of the affidavit and a request for foreclosure mediation form; etc.
Title
Real Property - Residential Property Foreclosure Procedures - Foreclosure
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (44-1) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-03-30 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Judicial Proceedings | |
2010-04-07 | Passed Enrolled | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (123-16) | |
2010-04-07 | House Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-24 | Third Reading Passed (119-21) | |
2010-03-23 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Administrative Hearings, Office of
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Counselors
Courts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Forms
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Mediation
Mortgages
Notices
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations
Administrative Office of the Courts
Appropriations
Civil Actions
Clerks of Court
Counselors
Courts
Disclosure
Electronic Government
Fees
Financial Regulation, Division of
Foreclosure
Forms
Housing
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Labor, Licensing, and Regulation, Department of
Mediation
Mortgages
Notices
Real Property
Reports
Revenue and Taxes
Rules and Regulations