MD HB474 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Repealing the Task Force on the Future for Growth and Development in Maryland; establishing the Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission; establishing the membership and the charge of the Commission; authorizing the Commission to adopt rules of procedure; etc.
Title
Smart, Green, and Growing - Maryland Sustainable Growth Commission
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-09 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 47 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-04-03 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-09 | Third Reading Passed (47-0) | |
2010-04-09 | Senate Recede | |
2010-04-09 | Committee Amendment Withdrawn | |
2010-04-09 | Motion Recede (Senator Conway) Adopted | |
2010-04-03 | Third Reading Passed with Amendments (46-0) | |
2010-04-02 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-04-02 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-03 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-08 | Returned Passed | |
2010-04-03 | Delegates Frush, Stein, and O'Donnell | |
2010-04-03 | Conference Committee Appointed | |
2010-04-03 | House Requests Senate Recede | |
2010-04-03 | House Refuses to Concur - Senate Amendments | |
2010-03-02 | Third Reading Passed (110-28) | |
2010-02-26 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-02-26 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-02-25 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environmental Matters | |
2010-02-03 | Hearing 2/17 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-01-29 | First Reading Environmental Matters |
Subjects
Committees and Commissions
Counties
Environmental Matters
Housing
Municipal Corporations
Planning, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Transportation
Zoning and Planning
Counties
Environmental Matters
Housing
Municipal Corporations
Planning, Department of
Reports
Sunset
Transportation
Zoning and Planning