MD HB477 | 2020 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future HB990
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 27 2020 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Pending: Senate Judicial Proceedings Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Requiring the State to pay reasonable attorney's fees incurred in representing an alleged disabled person who is indigent in a petition for the appointment of a guardian of the property of the person; and requiring the court, under certain circumstances, to appoint, for the alleged disabled person, an attorney who has contracted with the Maryland Department of Human Services, subject to a certain exception.
Title
Estates and Trusts – Guardianship of the Property of Disabled Persons –
Court–Appointed Attorneys
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-02-27 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 136 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-15 | Senate | Hearing canceled |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Hearing 3/17 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Referred Judicial Proceedings |
2020-02-27 | House | Third Reading Passed (136-0) |
2020-02-25 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2020-02-25 | House | Favorable with Amendments {582510/1 Adopted |
2020-02-24 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2020-01-24 | House | Hearing 2/12 at 1:00 p.m. |
2020-01-24 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Same As/Similar To
HB477 (Carry Over) 2020-03-15 - Hearing canceled
Subjects
Agents and Brokers
Attorneys
Communications
Contracts
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Fees
Indigent Persons
Parents and Guardians
Personal Property
Petitions
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Vulnerable Adults
Attorneys
Communications
Contracts
Disabilities
Estates and Trusts
Ethics
Fees
Indigent Persons
Parents and Guardians
Personal Property
Petitions
Real Property
Rules and Regulations
Social Services
Vulnerable Adults
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Estates and Trusts | 13 | 211 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |