MD HB493 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 33-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-05-19 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibiting a person from committing a specified act of extortion by wrongful use of actual or threatened notification of law enforcement officials about another person's undocumented or illegal immigration status.
Title
Criminal Law - Extortion - Immigration Status
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-29 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (45-0) (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-7) (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2016-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (129-7) (Y: 129 N: 7 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-05-19 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 537 |
2016-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (45-0) |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2016-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-04-04 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-18 | Senate | First Reading Judicial Proceedings |
2016-03-17 | House | Third Reading Passed (129-7) |
2016-03-16 | House | Second Reading Passed |
2016-03-15 | House | Special Order until 03/16 (Delegate McDonough) Adopted |
2016-03-15 | House | Favorable Report Adopted |
2016-03-14 | House | Favorable Report by Judiciary |
2016-02-16 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2016-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Extortion
Fines
Immigrants and Citizenship
Nonresidents
Penalties and Sentences
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Disclosure
Extortion
Fines
Immigrants and Citizenship
Nonresidents
Penalties and Sentences