MD HB493 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 7-4)
Status: Passed on April 30 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-04-30 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Clarifying that a person who solicits another or conspires with another to commit murder in the first degree is guilty of murder in the first degree if the death of another occurs as a result of the solicitation or conspiracy.
Title
Crimes – Solicitation and Conspiracy to Commit Murder Resulting in Death (Stacey’s Law)
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-02 - Senate - Senate Floor - Third Reading Passed (46-0) (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2019-03-31 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (139-0) (Y: 139 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-30 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 246 |
2019-04-08 | House | Returned Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (46-0) |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Motion two readings same day Const/Rule 24 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report Adopted |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Favorable Report by Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-08 | Senate | Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings |
2019-04-08 | Senate | First Reading Senate Rules |
2019-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (139-0) |
2019-04-06 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2019-04-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments {882617/1 Report Adopted |
2019-04-05 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Judiciary |
2019-02-01 | House | Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m. |
2019-02-01 | House | First Reading Judiciary |
Subjects
Crimes and Punishments
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Murder
Penalties and Sentences
Solicitation
Statutes of Limitation
Criminal Law - Substantive Crimes
Murder
Penalties and Sentences
Solicitation
Statutes of Limitation