MD HB503 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 19 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-02 - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Translation Grant Program in the State Department of Education to provide grants to county boards that are experiencing a significant number of requests to translate educational materials into a student's or parent's native language; requiring the Program to be a competitive grant program; requiring the Department to establish application procedures and supervise the use of certain funds; requiring the Governor to include at least $125,000 annually for the program beginning in fiscal year 2020; etc.
Title
State Department of Education - Translation Grant Program - Established
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-03-15 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (95-41) (Y: 96 N: 42 NV: 3 Abs: 8) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-02 | Senate | Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-28 | Senate | Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-03-19 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-19 | House | Third Reading Passed (95-41) |
2018-03-17 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments {865569/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-17 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means |
2018-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/15 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading Ways and Means |
Subjects
Appropriations
Communications
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Governor
Grants
Language
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology
Communications
Counties
Education
Education, Boards of
Education, State Department of
Governor
Grants
Language
Notices
Parents and Guardians
Primary and Secondary Education
Public Schools
Rules and Regulations
Students
Telecommunications and Information Technology