MD HB509 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 8 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-09 - First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Pending: Senate Education Health and Environmental Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [PDF]
Summary
Increasing from 15,500 to 31,000 gallons the annual amount of the products manufactured under a Class 9 limited distillery license that the holder of the license may sell at retail on a certain premises for on-sale or off-sale consumption.
Title
Alcoholic Beverages - Limited Distillery License - Retail Sales
Sponsors
Sen. Mary Carozza [R] | Del. Carl Anderton [R] | Del. Charles Barkley [D] | Del. Dereck Davis [D] |
Del. Charles Otto [R] |
Roll Calls
2018-03-08 - House - House Floor - Third Reading Passed (137-0) (Y: 138 N: 1 NV: 1 Abs: 9) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-09 | Senate | First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2018-03-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (137-0) |
2018-03-07 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2018-03-07 | House | Favorable with Amendments {313291/1 Report Adopted |
2018-03-06 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters |
2018-02-23 | House | Hearing 2/23 at 1:00 p.m. |
2018-01-26 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Alcoholic Beverages - Statewide Bills
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Industry and Technology
Retail Sales
Alcoholic Beverages Licenses
Industry and Technology
Retail Sales