MD HB531 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-05-20 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Extending the reporting and termination provisions relating to the Task Force to Study the Procurement of Health and Social Services by State Agencies; altering the appointment process for specified members of the Task Force; altering the staffing requirements for the Task Force; and expanding the scope of the Task Force to include education and renaming the Task Force.
Title
Task Force to Study the Procurement of Health, Education, and Social Services
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-04-07 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-20 | Approved by the Governor | |
2010-04-07 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2010-04-06 | Second Reading Passed | |
2010-04-06 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2010-04-09 | Favorable Report by Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-03-29 | Hearing 4/6 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-03-26 | First Reading Education Health and Environmental Affairs | |
2010-04-06 | Returned Passed | |
2010-03-23 | Third Reading Passed (137-3) | |
2010-03-22 | Second Reading Passed with Amendments | |
2010-03-22 | Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Favorable with Amendments Report by Health and Government Operations | |
2010-02-17 | Hearing 3/3 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2010-02-02 | First Reading Health and Government Operations |
Subjects
Administrative Agencies
Committees and Commissions
Education
Health
Names
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Social Services
Sunset
Committees and Commissions
Education
Health
Names
Procurement
Public Works, Board of
Reports
Social Services
Sunset