MD HB533 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-1)
Status: Passed on May 22 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-05-22 - Approved by the Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Altering the interest rate payable by specified lending institutions on escrow accounts created in connection with loans secured by a first mortgage or first deed of trust on residential real property; requiring the interest rate to be adjusted under specified circumstances; altering the interest rate payable by banking institutions on interest bearing accounts instituted for a specific purpose; etc.
Title
Financial Institutions - Interest Payable on Escrow Accounts and Specific
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-26 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2012-02-24 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 132 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 6) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-05-22 | Approved by the Governor | |
2012-03-26 | Third Reading Passed (46-0) | |
2012-03-25 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-03-25 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-03-29 | Favorable Report by Finance | |
2012-03-16 | Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-27 | First Reading Finance | |
2012-03-28 | Returned Passed | |
2012-02-24 | Third Reading Passed (132-3) | |
2012-02-21 | Second Reading Passed | |
2012-02-21 | Favorable Report Adopted | |
2012-02-20 | Favorable Report by Economic Matters | |
2012-02-07 | Hearing 2/14 at 1:00 p.m. | |
2012-02-03 | First Reading Economic Matters |
Subjects
Banks and Trust Companies
Escrow Accounts
Financial Institutions
Interest
Mortgages
Savings and Loan Associations
Escrow Accounts
Financial Institutions
Interest
Mortgages
Savings and Loan Associations