MD HB568 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 29 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizing a licensed title insurance producer to pay compensation for the provision of real estate brokerage services to associate real estate brokers, real estate salespersons, or certain business entities on behalf of a real estate broker in accordance with a written disbursement authorization provided by the real estate broker.
Title
Real Estate Associate Brokers and Salespersons – Compensation – Payment From Title Insurance Producer
Sponsors
Del. Ned Carey [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-04 - Senate - Third Reading Passed 46-0 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
2022-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 128 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 10) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-05-29 | House | Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 649 |
2022-04-05 | House | Returned Passed |
2022-04-04 | Senate | Third Reading Passed 46-0 |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-04-01 | Senate | Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-21 | Senate | Referred Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs |
2022-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (128-0) |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed |
2022-03-17 | House | Favorable Report by Economic Matters |
2022-02-03 | House | Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m. |
2022-01-31 | House | First Reading Economic Matters |
Same As/Similar To
SB425 (Crossfiled) 2022-05-29 - Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 650
Subjects
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 322 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Business Occupations and Professions | 17 | 604 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |