MD HB577 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Spectrum: Strong Partisan Bill (Democrat 11-1)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [PDF]
Summary
Establishing the Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program in the Department of Housing and Community Development; requiring the Study to review current habitability and admissions standards of homeless shelters in the State; and requiring the Study to report to a certain Assistant Secretary in the Department and certain committees in the General Assembly by July 1, 2025, its recommendations on habitability and admission standards and a plan to establish a program in the Department to license homeless shelters.
Title
Housing and Community Development - Study on the Establishment of a Homeless Shelter Licensing Program
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-08 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 121 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
2024-04-08 - Senate - Third Reading Passed (Y: 44 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2024-03-18 - House - Third Reading Passed (Y: 124 N: 9 NV: 1 Abs: 7) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | House | Approved by the Governor - Chapter 151 |
2024-04-08 | House | Passed Enrolled |
2024-04-08 | House | Third Reading Passed (121-17) |
2024-04-08 | House | House Concurs Senate Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Third Reading Passed (44-2) |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments {453127/1 Adopted |
2024-04-08 | Senate | Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | Senate | Referred Education, Energy, and the Environment |
2024-03-18 | House | Third Reading Passed (124-9) |
2024-03-15 | House | Second Reading Passed with Amendments |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments {433623/1 Adopted |
2024-03-15 | House | Favorable with Amendments Report by Environment and Transportation |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 12:30 p.m. |
2024-02-15 | House | Hearing canceled |
2024-01-25 | House | Hearing 2/16 at 1:00 p.m. |
2024-01-24 | House | First Reading Environment and Transportation |
Same As/Similar To
SB1107 (Crossfiled) 2024-04-25 - Approved by the Governor - Chapter 152
Subjects
Appeals
Building Codes
Fines
Forms
Fraud
Group Homes
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Inspections
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Employees
studies
Sunset
Building Codes
Fines
Forms
Fraud
Group Homes
Housing and Community Development
Housing and Community Development, Department of
Indigent Persons
Inspections
Licenses
Penalties and Sentences
Recruitment and Hiring
Reports
Rules and Regulations
Standards and Best Practices
State Employees
studies
Sunset
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1201 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1202 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1203 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1204 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1205 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1206 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |
Housing and Community Development | 6 | 1207 | (n/a) | See Bill Text |